TX HB3461 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Reported favorably as substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Reported favorably as substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to allowing TJJD to approve a small number of Regional Diversion Alternatives placements for youth with intense needs at a higher rate than the average daily cost of state secure facilities.
Title
Relating to allowing TJJD to approve a small number of Regional Diversion Alternatives placements for youth with intense needs at a higher rate than the average daily cost of state secure facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-02 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-05-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-05-02 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-05-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues |
2019-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-06 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB3461 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB03461I.htm |