TX HB3467 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the acquisition and management of certain real property assets by the School Land Board for the use and benefit of the permanent school fund and the transfer of certain permanent school fund assets from the control of the School Land Board to the State Board of Education.
Title
Relating to the acquisition and management of certain real property assets by the School Land Board for the use and benefit of the permanent school fund and the transfer of certain permanent school fund assets from the control of the School Land Board to the State Board of Education.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken King [R] | Rep. Four Price [R] | Rep. Robert Guerra [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1659 (Same As) 2019-05-07 - Referred to Public Education
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
GENERAL LAND OFFICE
PERMANENT SCHOOL FUND
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Public Lands, Buildings & Resources
SCHOOL LAND BOARD
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
GENERAL LAND OFFICE
PERMANENT SCHOOL FUND
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Public Lands, Buildings & Resources
SCHOOL LAND BOARD
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB3467 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB03467I.htm |