TX HB347 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to consent annexation requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to consent annexation requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-13 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1352 (Y: 131 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - FA1 Lucio (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Amended RV#207 (Y: 133 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#183 (Y: 98 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - 1-P. King RV#182 (Y: 86 N: 54 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24 Effective immediately
2019-05-24 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-14 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-14SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-14HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-14SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-13HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-13HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2019-05-13HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-13HouseRecord vote RV#1352
2019-05-13HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2019-05-09HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-09HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-08HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-08SenateRecord vote
2019-05-08SenatePassed
2019-05-08SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-08SenateRecord vote
2019-05-08SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-08SenateRecord vote
2019-05-08SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-08SenateRecord vote
2019-05-08SenateAmended
2019-05-08SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Lucio
2019-05-08SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-08SenateRecord vote
2019-05-08SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-02SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-04-30SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-04-29SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-29SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-29SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-04-29SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-29SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-04-25SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-04-25SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-25SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-25SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-25SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-16SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-04-16SenateRead first time
2019-04-11SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-09HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-09HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-09HouseRecord vote RV#207
2019-04-09HousePassed as amended
2019-04-09HouseAmended 1-P. King
2019-04-09HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-08HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-08HouseRecord vote RV#183
2019-04-08HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-04-08HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-08HouseRecord vote RV#182
2019-04-08HouseAmended 2-Burns
2019-04-08HouseAmended 1-P. King
2019-04-08HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-08HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-05HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-02HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-26HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-03-26HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-03-26HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-18HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-03-18HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-05HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-05HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-05HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-05HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-19HouseReferred to Land & Resource Management
2019-02-19HouseRead first time
2018-11-14HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB408 (Same As) 2019-03-19 - Co-author authorized

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB347
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00347I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00347H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00347E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00347S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00347F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB347&RcdVtNo=182&Ch=H&Dt=04/08/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB347&RcdVtNo=183&Ch=H&Dt=04/08/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB347&RcdVtNo=207&Ch=H&Dt=04/09/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-08-F.PDF#page=16
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-08-F.PDF#page=17
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB347&RcdVtNo=1352&Ch=H&Dt=05/13/2019

Bill Comments

feedback