TX HB3494 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the prosecution of the offense of operation of an unmanned aircraft over certain facilities and to the regulation of unmanned aircraft by certain political subdivisions.
Title
Relating to the prosecution of the offense of operation of an unmanned aircraft over certain facilities and to the regulation of unmanned aircraft by certain political subdivisions.
Sponsors
Rep. Sheryl Cole [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-06 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB3494 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB03494I.htm |