TX HB3525 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the destruction of juvenile court records of victims of sex trafficking.
Title
Relating to the destruction of juvenile court records of victims of sex trafficking.
Sponsors
Rep. Toni Rose [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-24 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues |
2019-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-06 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CRIME VICTIMS
Crimes
Crimes--Against Morals
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Crimes--Juvenile
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
HUMAN TRAFFICKING
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
Minors--Juvenile Justice
Crimes
Crimes--Against Morals
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Crimes--Juvenile
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
HUMAN TRAFFICKING
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
Minors--Juvenile Justice