TX HB3564 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to remedies after certain casualty losses to residential rental premises.
Title
Relating to remedies after certain casualty losses to residential rental premises.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-07 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-29 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2019-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB518 (Same As) 2019-04-30 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Insurance
Insurance--Property & Casualty
Property Interests
Property Interests--Landlord & Tenant
Insurance
Insurance--Property & Casualty
Property Interests
Property Interests--Landlord & Tenant