TX HB3565 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House International Relations & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House International Relations & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of certain pilot programs to encourage economic and educational opportunities in certain regions of this state.
Title
Relating to the creation of certain pilot programs to encourage economic and educational opportunities in certain regions of this state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to International Relations & Economic Development |
2019-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2380 (Same As) 2019-04-23 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Rural
Education--School Districts
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Rural
Education--School Districts
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB3565 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB03565I.htm |