TX HB3587 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the prosecution of the offense of aggravated kidnapping; creating a criminal offense.
Title
Relating to the prosecution of the offense of aggravated kidnapping; creating a criminal offense.
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Hunter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2019-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1729 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
KIDNAPPING
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
KIDNAPPING
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB3587 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB03587I.htm |