TX HB3622 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Postponed 7/5/19 10:00 AM
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Postponed 7/5/19 10:00 AM
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the adoption of certain plumbing codes by the Texas State Board of Plumbing Examiners.
Title
Relating to the adoption of certain plumbing codes by the Texas State Board of Plumbing Examiners.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Postponed 7/5/19 10:00 AM |
2019-05-09 | House | Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2) |
2019-05-09 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-05-08 | House | Postponed 5/9/19 8:30 AM |
2019-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-07 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-29 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2019-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1106 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Subjects
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PLUMBERS & PLUMBING
PLUMBING EXAMINERS, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PLUMBERS & PLUMBING
PLUMBING EXAMINERS, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF