TX HB3631 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-16 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-16 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the confidentiality of the e-mail address of an applicant for or holder of a license issued by certain state agencies.
Title
Relating to the confidentiality of the e-mail address of an applicant for or holder of a license issued by certain state agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1197 (Y: 136 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-09 | House | Record vote RV#1197 |
2019-05-09 | House | Passed |
2019-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-08 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-07 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-18 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-06 | House | Filed |
Subjects
EMAIL & ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Open Records
Protection of Personal Information
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Open Records
Protection of Personal Information