TX HB3637 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-03 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-03 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the confidentiality of certain personal information of a person protected by a magistrate's order for emergency protection.
Title
Relating to the confidentiality of certain personal information of a person protected by a magistrate's order for emergency protection.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2019-05-03 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SB 2390 |
2019-05-03 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-04-30 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-24 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-08 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2019-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2390 (Same As) 2019-05-20 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
MAGISTRATES
Protection of Personal Information
PROTECTIVE ORDERS
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Criminal Procedure--General
MAGISTRATES
Protection of Personal Information
PROTECTIVE ORDERS
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF