TX HB3657 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Referred to Higher Education
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Referred to Higher Education
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the establishment of the Texas Competency-Based Education Grant Program for certain students enrolled in competency-based baccalaureate degree programs and to formula funding and dropped and repeated course restrictions for students enrolled in those degree programs at public institutions of higher education.
Title
Relating to the establishment of the Texas Competency-Based Education Grant Program for certain students enrolled in competency-based baccalaureate degree programs and to formula funding and dropped and repeated course restrictions for students enrolled in those degree programs at public institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1307 (Y: 80 N: 51 NV: 3 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-13 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-10 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-10 | House | Record vote RV#1307 |
2019-05-10 | House | Passed |
2019-05-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-09 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-09 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-11 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-11 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-10 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1770 (Same As) 2019-04-17 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--Higher--Student Fees
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
Education--Higher--Tuition
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--Higher--Student Fees
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
Education--Higher--Tuition
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS