TX HB3679 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation and operations of health care provider participation programs in certain counties.
Title
Relating to the creation and operations of health care provider participation programs in certain counties.
Sponsors
Rep. James Frank [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-07 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-28 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-28 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-28 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-28 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2019-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2286 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Effective immediately
Subjects
County Government
County Government--Finance
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
Hospitals
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital
County Government--Finance
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
Hospitals
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital