TX HB3699 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-22 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-22 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of the Health and Human Services Commission to obtain criminal history record information.
Title
Relating to the authority of the Health and Human Services Commission to obtain criminal history record information.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2200 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Effective immediately
Subjects
CRIMINAL RECORDS
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF