TX HB3710 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to providing school districts electronic tutorials for certain end-of-course assessment instruments required for graduation.
Title
Relating to providing school districts electronic tutorials for certain end-of-course assessment instruments required for graduation.
Sponsors
Rep. Keith Bell [R] | Rep. Alma Allen [D] | Rep. Trent Ashby [R] | Rep. Diego Bernal [D] |
Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R] | Rep. Andrew Murr [R] | Rep. Chris Paddie [R] | Rep. Dennis Paul [R] |
Rep. Scott Sanford [R] | Rep. Hugh Shine [R] | Rep. Ed Thompson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-07 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-11 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-02 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-02 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing