TX HB3712 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-22 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-22 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the inclusion of information about the process of voting as part of the social studies curriculum requirements for public high school students.
Title
Relating to the inclusion of information about the process of voting as part of the social studies curriculum requirements for public high school students.
Sponsors
Rep. John Bucy [D] | Rep. Alma Allen [D] | Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D] | Rep. James Talarico [D] |
Rep. Gina Hinojosa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Elections
Elections--Registration & Suffrage
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Elections
Elections--Registration & Suffrage