TX HB372 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the punishment for the offense of driving while license invalid.
Title
Relating to the punishment for the offense of driving while license invalid.
Sponsors
Rep. Alma Allen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2019-02-19 | House | Read first time |
2018-11-15 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB663 (Same As) 2019-03-01 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB372 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00372I.htm |