TX HB3782 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the right to remove property encroaching on areas owned or controlled by the Harris County Flood Control District.
Title
Relating to the right to remove property encroaching on areas owned or controlled by the Harris County Flood Control District.
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Harless [R] | Rep. Sarah Davis [R] | Rep. Jim Murphy [R] | Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D] |
Rep. Mary Perez [D] | Sen. Carol Alvarado [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1901 (Y: 117 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1065 (Y: 134 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1065 (Y: 134 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-25 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-24 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2019-05-24 | House | Record vote RV#1901 |
2019-05-24 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Water & Rural Affairs |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-07 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-07 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-07 | House | Record vote RV#1065 |
2019-05-07 | House | Passed |
2019-05-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-06 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-05-06 | House | Amended 1-Harless |
2019-05-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-30 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-18 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-16 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-09 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-02 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-02 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2019-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility