TX HB380 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the authority of a district court to hear and determine certain ad valorem tax appeals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the authority of a district court to hear and determine certain ad valorem tax appeals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#482 (Y: 137 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-05-24 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-14 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-14SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-13HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-10HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-09HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-09SenateRecord vote
2019-05-09SenatePassed
2019-05-09SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-09SenateRecord vote
2019-05-09SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-09SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-09SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-09SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-09SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-08SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-06SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-06SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-02SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-30SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-30SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-30SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-30SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-30SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-30SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-30SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-29SenateMeeting cancelled
2019-04-29SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Property Tax
2019-04-24SenateRead first time
2019-04-23SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-17HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-17HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-17HouseRecord vote RV#482
2019-04-17HousePassed
2019-04-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-16HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-16HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-16HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-16HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-12HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-05HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-03HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-02HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-02HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-28HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-03-28HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-13HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-13HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-13HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-13HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-19HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2019-02-19HouseRead first time
2018-11-16HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback