TX HB3800 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to required reporting of human trafficking cases by certain law enforcement entities and by prosecutors.
Title
Relating to required reporting of human trafficking cases by certain law enforcement entities and by prosecutors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-26 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-26 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#2022 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1281 (Y: 136 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-26 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#2022 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1281 (Y: 136 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-27 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-26 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2019-05-26 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2019-05-26 | House | Record vote RV#2022 |
2019-05-26 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2019-05-25 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Senate grants request for conference comm. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House requests conference committee-reported |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House refuses to concur-reported |
2019-05-24 | House | House appoints conferees |
2019-05-24 | House | House requests conference committee |
2019-05-24 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-10 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-10 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-10 | House | Record vote RV#1281 |
2019-05-10 | House | Passed |
2019-05-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-09 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2019-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1920 (Same As) 2019-03-19 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
HUMAN TRAFFICKING
Law Enforcement
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
PEACE OFFICERS
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
HUMAN TRAFFICKING
Law Enforcement
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
PEACE OFFICERS
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF