TX HB3809 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the limitations period for personal injury claims that arise from certain offenses involving child sexual abuse.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the limitations period for personal injury claims that arise from certain offenses involving child sexual abuse.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1801 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#928 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-25HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-24SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-24HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2019-05-24HouseRecord vote RV#1801
2019-05-24HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2019-05-22HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-22HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-21HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-21SenateRecord vote
2019-05-21SenatePassed
2019-05-21SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-21SenateRecord vote
2019-05-21SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-21SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-21SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-21SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-21SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-21SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-19SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-19SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-19SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-13SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-13SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-13SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-13SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-03SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-05-03SenateRead first time
2019-05-02SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-02HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-02HouseRecord vote RV#928
2019-05-02HousePassed
2019-05-02HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-01HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-05-01HouseAmended 1-Goldman
2019-05-01HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-30HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-26HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-22HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-15HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-15HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-15HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-08HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-08HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-19HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2019-03-19HouseRead first time
2019-03-07HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback