TX HB3813 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the removal from office of a public officer of a political subdivision for policies or actions regarding immigration enforcement.
Title
Relating to the removal from office of a public officer of a political subdivision for policies or actions regarding immigration enforcement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB168 (Same As) 2019-02-01 - Referred to State Affairs
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Employees/Officers
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
IMMIGRATION LAW
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
City Government--Employees/Officers
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
IMMIGRATION LAW
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB3813 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB03813I.htm |