TX HB3821 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to annexation by certain municipalities of a special district under a strategic partnership agreement.
Title
Relating to annexation by certain municipalities of a special district under a strategic partnership agreement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred to Land & Resource Management |
2019-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1468 (Same As) 2019-06-10 - Effective immediately
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Annexation
City Government--General
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
City Government--Annexation
City Government--General
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts