TX HB3849 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the powers and duties of a personal bond or personal bond and pretrial supervision office.
Title
Relating to the powers and duties of a personal bond or personal bond and pretrial supervision office.
Sponsors
Rep. Cecil Bell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-25 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2019-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB3849 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB03849I.htm |