TX HB3860 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a child's eligibility for the Medicaid buy-in for children program or the medically dependent children (MDCP) waiver program.
Title
Relating to a child's eligibility for the Medicaid buy-in for children program or the medically dependent children (MDCP) waiver program.
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Krause [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-02 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2019-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1825 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Subjects
Disabilities, Persons with
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MEDICAID
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MEDICAID
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB3860 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB03860I.htm |