TX HB389 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-15 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the regulation of game rooms in certain counties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the regulation of game rooms in certain counties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#320 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-15 Vetoed by the Governor
2019-05-16 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-16SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-16HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-15HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-15HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-15SenateRecord vote
2019-05-15SenatePassed
2019-05-15SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-15SenateRecord vote
2019-05-15SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-15SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-15SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-15SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2019-05-15SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-09SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-06SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-06SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-06SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-01SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-29SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-29SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-29SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-16SenateReferred to Intergovernmental Relations
2019-04-16SenateRead first time
2019-04-15SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-12HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-12HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-12HouseRecord vote RV#320
2019-04-12HousePassed
2019-04-12HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-12HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-12HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-12HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-12HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-04-03HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-04-01HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-01HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-25HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-03-25HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-03-25HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-25HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2019-02-19HouseReferred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
2019-02-19HouseRead first time
2018-11-19HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback