TX HB3893 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to tuition and fees exemptions at public institutions of higher education for certain dual credit students considering a teaching career.
Title
Relating to tuition and fees exemptions at public institutions of higher education for certain dual credit students considering a teaching career.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2425 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Referred to Higher Education
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Student Fees
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
Education--Higher--Tuition
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Student Fees
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
Education--Higher--Tuition
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB3893 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB03893I.htm |