TX HB3898 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Companion considered in lieu of in committee
Pending: House County Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the authority of a county to require electronic bids or proposals for competitive bidding.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the authority of a county to require electronic bids or proposals for competitive bidding.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16HouseCompanion considered in lieu of in committee
2019-04-04HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-04HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-04HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-04HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-19HouseReferred to County Affairs
2019-03-19HouseRead first time
2019-03-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB124 (Same As) 2019-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback