TX HB3904 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-14 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-14 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to public school accountability, including certain performance standards and sanctions, to providing alternative methods to satisfy certain public high school graduation requirements, and to public school class size limits.
Title
Relating to public school accountability, including certain performance standards and sanctions, to providing alternative methods to satisfy certain public high school graduation requirements, and to public school class size limits.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Huberty [R] | Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] | Rep. Richard Raymond [D] | Rep. Christina Morales [D] |
Sen. Larry Taylor [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-03 - House - Amended RV#1017 (Y: 134 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-05 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-03 | House | Record vote RV#1017 |
2019-05-03 | House | Passed as amended |
2019-05-03 | House | Amended 1-C. Turner |
2019-05-03 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-05-03 | House | Postponed 5/3/19 2:30 PM |
2019-05-03 | House | Point of order withdrawn Rule 8, Section 3; Article III, Section 35 |
2019-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-05-02 | House | Amended 2-Stickland |
2019-05-02 | House | Amended 1-Huberty |
2019-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-30 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-26 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-18 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-11 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-03-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
DROPOUTS & AT-RISK STUDENTS
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing