TX HB3905 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-22 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-22 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of certain counties to adopt and enforce park use rules.
Title
Relating to the authority of certain counties to adopt and enforce park use rules.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-04 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-02 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2019-03-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1860 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - Referred to Water & Rural Affairs
Subjects
County Government
County Government--General
Parks & Wildlife
Parks & Wildlife--Parks
Public Lands, Buildings & Resources
County Government--General
Parks & Wildlife
Parks & Wildlife--Parks
Public Lands, Buildings & Resources
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB3905 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB03905I.htm |