TX HB3907 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to use of the electronic funds transfer system operated by the comptroller.
Title
Relating to use of the electronic funds transfer system operated by the comptroller.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-03-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB557 (Same As) 2019-06-02 - Effective immediately
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
ELECTRONIC FUNDS TRANSFER
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--Police & Firefighters
Salaries & Expenses
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
ELECTRONIC FUNDS TRANSFER
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--Police & Firefighters
Salaries & Expenses
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB3907 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB03907I.htm |