TX HB3912 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-14 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-14 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to state agency reports submitted to the legislature.
Title
Relating to state agency reports submitted to the legislature.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - House - Read 3rd time RV#525 (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-18 | House | Record vote RV#525 |
2019-04-18 | House | Passed |
2019-04-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-17 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-15 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-10 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-03-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed |