TX HB3950 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-23 - Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-23 - Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the establishment of the Joint Committee on Child Welfare.
Title
Relating to the establishment of the Joint Committee on Child Welfare.
Sponsors
Rep. James Frank [R] | Rep. Ina Minjarez [D] | Rep. Stephanie Klick [R] | Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R] |
Sen. Charles Schwertner [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1039 (Y: 141 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1019 (Y: 70 N: 74 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1039 (Y: 141 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1019 (Y: 70 N: 74 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA2 West |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Kolkhorst |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-07 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-07 | House | Record vote RV#1039 |
2019-05-07 | House | Passed |
2019-05-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-06 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-06 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-06 | House | Record vote RV#1019 |
2019-05-06 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 1-Wu |
2019-05-06 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-05-01 | House | Postponed 5/3/19 10:00 AM |
2019-05-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-29 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-23 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-12 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-12 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-12 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2019-03-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CHILD WELFARE TASK FORCE
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
Governor
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Child Services
JOINT COMMITTEE ON CHILD WELFARE
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
Governor
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Child Services
JOINT COMMITTEE ON CHILD WELFARE
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE