TX HB3991 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the deaf-blind with multiple disabilities waiver program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the deaf-blind with multiple disabilities waiver program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1146 (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-05-10SenateRead first time
2019-05-08SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-08HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-08HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-08HouseRecord vote RV#1146
2019-05-08HousePassed
2019-05-08HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-07HousePassed to engrossment
2019-05-07HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-06HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-30HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-30HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-30HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-23HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-23HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-23HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-16HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-16HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-16HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-16HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-21HouseReferred to Human Services
2019-03-21HouseRead first time
2019-03-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB2139 (Similar To) 2019-03-27 - Co-author authorized

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback