TX HB4000 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-22 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-22 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a study conducted by the Legislative Budget Board on the impact of federal educational mandates on school districts.
Title
Relating to a study conducted by the Legislative Budget Board on the impact of federal educational mandates on school districts.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Toth [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-03-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--Higher--General
Education--School Districts
LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--Higher--General
Education--School Districts
LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD