TX HB4008 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to plans required to be submitted to be eligible to receive funding through the Major Events Reimbursement Program.
Title
Relating to plans required to be submitted to be eligible to receive funding through the Major Events Reimbursement Program.
Sponsors
Rep. John Frullo [R] | Rep. Joseph Moody [D] | Rep. John Cyrier [R] | Rep. Matt Krause [R] |
Rep. Eddie Rodriguez [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#990 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-04 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-03 | House | Record vote RV#990 |
2019-05-03 | House | Passed |
2019-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-30 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-26 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism |
2019-03-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
HUMAN TRAFFICKING
HUMAN TRAFFICKING PREVENTION TASK FORCE
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
HUMAN TRAFFICKING PREVENTION TASK FORCE
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control