TX HB4009 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the establishment, operation, and funding of victim-offender mediation programs; authorizing fees.
Title
Relating to the establishment, operation, and funding of victim-offender mediation programs; authorizing fees.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Toth [R] | Rep. Eugene Wu [D] | Rep. Ed Thompson [R] | Rep. Terry Canales [D] |
Rep. Dennis Paul [R] | Rep. Scott Sanford [R] | Rep. Valoree Swanson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - House - Read 3rd time RV#841 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-01 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-01 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-01 | House | Record vote RV#841 |
2019-05-01 | House | Passed |
2019-05-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-30 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2019-04-30 | House | Amended 1-Wu |
2019-04-30 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-04-29 | House | Postponed 4/30/19 10:00 AM |
2019-04-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-25 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Corrections |
2019-03-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CRIME VICTIMS
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Pretrial Procedure
JUVENILE JUSTICE BOARD, TEXAS
JUVENILE JUSTICE DEPARTMENT, TEXAS
Legislature
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
MEDIATION, DISPUTE RESOLUTION, & ARBITRATION
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Pretrial Procedure
JUVENILE JUSTICE BOARD, TEXAS
JUVENILE JUSTICE DEPARTMENT, TEXAS
Legislature
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
MEDIATION, DISPUTE RESOLUTION, & ARBITRATION
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE