TX HB403 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to training requirements for a member of the board of trustees and the superintendent of an independent school district regarding sexual abuse, human trafficking, and other maltreatment of children.
Title
Relating to training requirements for a member of the board of trustees and the superintendent of an independent school district regarding sexual abuse, human trafficking, and other maltreatment of children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#59 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#59 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-05-25 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-16 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-15 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-15 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Rereferred to committee |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-03-20 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-03-20 | House | Record vote RV#59 |
2019-03-20 | House | Passed |
2019-03-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-19 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-03-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-19 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-03-13 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-12 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-03-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-06 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-03-06 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-02-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-02-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-02-20 | House | Read first time |
2018-11-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB458 (Same As) 2019-03-19 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
CHILD ABUSE
CONTINUING EDUCATION
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
HUMAN TRAFFICKING
SEXUAL ABUSE
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
CONTINUING EDUCATION
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
HUMAN TRAFFICKING
SEXUAL ABUSE
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING