TX HB4032 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 26 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the regulation, permitting, and taxation of certain boats and boat motors; imposing a fee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the regulation, permitting, and taxation of certain boats and boat motors; imposing a fee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1925 (Y: 82 N: 55 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - House - Motion fails RV#1823 (Y: 68 N: 74 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1304 (Y: 113 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-14 Filed without the Governor's signature
2019-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-26HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-24SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-24HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2019-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-24HouseRecord vote RV#1925
2019-05-24HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2019-05-24HouseVote reconsidered
2019-05-24House1 hr. notice-for reconsideration
2019-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-24HouseRecord vote RV#1823
2019-05-24HouseMotion fails
2019-05-24HouseMotion to concur in Senate amendment(s)
2019-05-22HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-22HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-22HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenatePassed
2019-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22SenateAmended
2019-05-22SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Taylor
2019-05-22SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-22SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2019-05-21SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-19SenateCorrected comm. report printed & distributed
2019-05-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-19SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-14SenateReferred to Finance
2019-05-14SenateRead first time
2019-05-13SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-10HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-10HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-10HouseRecord vote RV#1304
2019-05-10HousePassed
2019-05-10HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-09HousePassed to engrossment
2019-05-09HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-08HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-06HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-26HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-25HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-25HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-23HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-23HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-10HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-10HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-10HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-10HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-21HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2019-03-21HouseRead first time
2019-03-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1669 (Same As) 2019-04-24 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB4032
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB04032I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB04032E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB04032S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB04032F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB4032&RcdVtNo=1304&Ch=H&Dt=05/10/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB4032&RcdVtNo=1823&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB4032&RcdVtNo=1925&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-22-F.PDF#page=4
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-22-F.PDF#page=5
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-22-F.PDF#page=6

Bill Comments

feedback