TX HB4045 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Left pending in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Left pending in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to authorizing the possession, use, cultivation, distribution, transportation, and delivery of medical cannabis for medical use by patients with certain eligible medical conditions and the licensing of dispensing organizations; changing a fee.
Title
Relating to authorizing the possession, use, cultivation, distribution, transportation, and delivery of medical cannabis for medical use by patients with certain eligible medical conditions and the licensing of dispensing organizations; changing a fee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2019-04-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2019-04-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2019-04-08 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-03-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Drugs
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
MARIHUANA
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Crimes--Drugs
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
MARIHUANA
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB4045 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB04045I.htm |