TX HB4055 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the availability under Medicaid of certain drugs used to treat human immunodeficiency virus or prevent acquired immune deficiency syndrome.
Title
Relating to the availability under Medicaid of certain drugs used to treat human immunodeficiency virus or prevent acquired immune deficiency syndrome.
Sponsors
Rep. Eugene Wu [D] | Rep. Stephanie Klick [R] | Rep. Toni Rose [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-03-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1283 (Same As) 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
Health
Health--AIDS
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MEDICAID
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
Health--AIDS
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MEDICAID
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS