TX HB4094 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to school district grace period policies and the provision of meals to public school students with insufficient balances on prepaid meal cards or meal accounts.
Title
Relating to school district grace period policies and the provision of meals to public school students with insufficient balances on prepaid meal cards or meal accounts.
Sponsors
Rep. Michelle Beckley [D] | Rep. Carl Sherman [D] | Rep. Diego Bernal [D] | Rep. Morgan Meyer [R] |
Rep. Angie Button [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-24 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-23 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-03-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
FOOD
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
FOOD