TX HB4104 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the punishment for the offense of prostitution and to programs for certain defendants charged with or convicted of prostitution.
Title
Relating to the punishment for the offense of prostitution and to programs for certain defendants charged with or convicted of prostitution.
Sponsors
Rep. James White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-23 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-23 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to Corrections |
2019-03-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COURT ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF
Crimes
Crimes--Against Morals
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
EXPUNCTION OF RECORDS
HUMAN TRAFFICKING
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
PROSTITUTION
Crimes
Crimes--Against Morals
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
EXPUNCTION OF RECORDS
HUMAN TRAFFICKING
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
PROSTITUTION