TX HB4131 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to prohibiting public schools from owning or having a business interest in certain entities and real property associated with those entities.
Title
Relating to prohibiting public schools from owning or having a business interest in certain entities and real property associated with those entities.
Sponsors
Rep. Valoree Swanson [R] | Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Dennis Paul [R] | Rep. Scott Sanford [R] |
Rep. William Zedler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-24 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-03-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1133 (Same As) 2019-05-02 - Referred to Public Education
Subjects
Amusements, Games, Sports
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property