TX HB4153 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the compensation and benefits of persons wrongfully imprisoned.
Title
Relating to the compensation and benefits of persons wrongfully imprisoned.
Sponsors
Rep. Rafael Anchia [D] | Rep. John Zerwas [R] | Rep. Toni Rose [D] | Rep. Matt Schaefer [R] |
Rep. Oscar Longoria [D] | Rep. Carl Sherman [D] | Rep. John Turner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-07 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-03-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
WRONGFUL IMPRISONMENT
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
WRONGFUL IMPRISONMENT