TX HB4165 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to authorization by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board for certain public junior colleges to offer baccalaureate degree programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to authorization by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board for certain public junior colleges to offer baccalaureate degree programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1220 (Y: 117 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-15SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-15SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-14SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-10SenateReferred to Higher Education
2019-05-10SenateRead first time
2019-05-09SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-09HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-09HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-09HouseRecord vote RV#1220
2019-05-09HousePassed
2019-05-09HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-08HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-08HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-05-08HouseAmended 3-Muñoz
2019-05-08HouseAmended 2-Pacheco
2019-05-08HouseAmendment withdrawn 1-Muñoz
2019-05-08HouseLaid out as postponed business
2019-05-07HousePostponed 5/8/19 6:00 PM
2019-05-07HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-06HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-26HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-25HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-25HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-25HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-25HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-10HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-10HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-10HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-10HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-25HouseReferred to Higher Education
2019-03-25HouseRead first time
2019-03-08HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB2411 (Similar To) 2019-03-21 - Referred to Higher Education

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback