TX HB4178 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the operation and administration of certain health and human services programs, including the Medicaid managed care program.
Title
Relating to the operation and administration of certain health and human services programs, including the Medicaid managed care program.
Sponsors
Rep. James Frank [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2019-03-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2239 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Subjects
DRUG UTILIZATION REVIEW BOARD
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Children's Insurance
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MANAGED CARE
MEDICAID
MEDICARE
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Children's Insurance
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MANAGED CARE
MEDICAID
MEDICARE