TX HB4192 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to claims and overpayment recoupment processes imposed on health care providers under Medicaid and other public benefits programs.
Title
Relating to claims and overpayment recoupment processes imposed on health care providers under Medicaid and other public benefits programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2019-03-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1991 (Same As) 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
Electronic Information Systems
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MANAGED CARE
MEDICAID
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MANAGED CARE
MEDICAID
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB4192 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB04192I.htm |