TX HB4202 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the authority of a court to grant a motion for a new trial in certain criminal cases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the authority of a court to grant a motion for a new trial in certain criminal cases.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1229 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2019-05-10SenateRead first time
2019-05-09SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-09HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-09HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-09HouseRecord vote RV#1229
2019-05-09HousePassed
2019-05-09HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-08HousePassed to engrossment
2019-05-08HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-07HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-01HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-01HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-30HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-25HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-25HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-08HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-08HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-25HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2019-03-25HouseRead first time
2019-03-08HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback