TX HB4203 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use of municipal hotel occupancy tax revenue by certain municipalities.
Title
Relating to the use of municipal hotel occupancy tax revenue by certain municipalities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2019-03-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2137 (Same As) 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
Amusements, Games, Sports
City Government
City Government--Land Use & Zoning
Taxation
Taxation--Hotel, Motel Occupancy
City Government
City Government--Land Use & Zoning
Taxation
Taxation--Hotel, Motel Occupancy
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB4203 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB04203I.htm |